Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1432 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14838 Week
» 67854 Month
» 187381 Year
» 3214234 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
58241 |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
1357 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Thu 01/01/1886 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 30/06/1955 |
Service Life |
69 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
01/01/1886 |
18A |
|
Toton |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
84G |
|
Shrewsbury |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
84G |
|
Shrewsbury |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
30/06/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58241 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
30/06/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58241 |
|
|
12/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|