Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3521 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16927 Week
» 69943 Month
» 189470 Year
» 3216323 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
58272 |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
Mon 01/01/1896 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1954 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 4 mths , 30 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8E |
Brunswick |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
14/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/05/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58272 |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
14/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
06/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58272 |
|
|