Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 953 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2027 Week
» 27388 Month
» 260308 Year
» 1925684 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 537 m/e 08/1899
British Railways 40537 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class 2P
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 08/1899
Withdrawal Fri 31/08/1962 (At Derby Works)
Withdrawal Notes At Derby Works
Service Life 63 yrs , 1 mth

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1899
15B   Kettering on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18C   Hasland 3w/e 14/01/1950
18C   Hasland w/e 21/01/1950
16A   Nottingham 4w/e 01/12/1956
18C   Hasland 4w/e 16/06/1957
21B   Bournville 4w/e 14/06/1958
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 21/02/1959
84D   Leamington 4w/e 09/09/1961
82G   Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 24/03/1962
     Withdrawn on 31/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 18C Hasland w/e 21/01/1950
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 18C Hasland 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 21B Bournville 4w/e 14/06/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 09/09/1961
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 24/03/1962
WDN   m/e 31/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 Derby Works Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. SLS/195006
07/09/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop : ED3, D59, D90/6, D138, D144, D5011/33, 10001. Test House : D104. Outside Test House : D109, D178/9/80/1/3, D5034/81. Shunter Test House : D3290, D3773. New Building: D186-D193, D5186. Finishing Shop: D184/5, D5086. Erecting Shop: ED7, D2506/8, D3056, D3292, 40537 (being cut-up), 42081, 42100, 44160, 44414/20, 48008, 48224, 73013, 73157, 75037/47/54. Paint Shop: D182, M.R. 1000, 73137. 'Stone Pitt': 42408, 44583, 75028. 'Foundry Row' : 42305/85, 42500, 44557, 47457. 'Klondyke Sidings': D40, D79. D110, D131, D5077, D5136, 10201/3, 44020 an 44122 (frames only). SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1899 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 537
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kettering (15B)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40537    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
21/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bournville (21B)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
31/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40537    
09/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev