Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 541 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18344 Week
» 71360 Month
» 190887 Year
» 3217740 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15264 |
y/e |
c. 0 |
British Railways |
55264 |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. McIntosh |
Class |
2P |
Company History |
CR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nasmyth Wilson |
To Service |
During 06/1925 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1961 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1925 |
30D |
|
Ayr |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
67B |
|
Hurlford |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
67A |
|
Corkerhill |
4w/e |
04/07/1959 |
67D |
|
Ardrossan |
4w/e |
11/02/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
67B |
Hurlford |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
4w/e |
04/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
67D |
Ardrossan |
4w/e |
11/02/1961 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15264 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ayr (30D) |
|
|
10/03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55264 |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55264 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|