Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 915 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14321 Week
» 67337 Month
» 186864 Year
» 3213717 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
258 |
m/e |
08/1894 |
British Railways |
30258 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
G6 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 08/1894 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/07/1961 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BAS |
Basingstoke |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
70D |
Basingstoke |
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 258 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (BAS) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30258 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
13/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
29/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30258 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|