|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Dorchester MPD | 'T.9' No. 300 has been transferred from Fratton to Dorchester to replace No. 281, which is now in store inside Dorchester shed. | SLS/194802 |
25/10/1951 | Eastleigh Works | In shops, 30071, 30073, 30129 (being lined), 30183 (lined, ready to leave), 30236, 30248, 30316, 30327, 30368, 30466, 30487, 30520 (now plain black, was lined W/E 20/11/48), 30572, 30749, 30772, 30826, 30863, 30902, 32421 (general-being repainted), 32640 (slight attention), 34042/60/70/81/94/95, 34105, 35011 (dark green), 42099, an 73797 (from Longmoor). Being cut up, 30281, 32086. Awaiting same fate s282, 30417, 30432, (3)2056, -(3)2067. For shops: 30315, 30480, 30588, 34005/33/51, 34108, 35005/9. Recently ex shops: B.R. green, 30767/73 (W/E 13/10), 30797 an 34045 (20/10). 'L.N.W.' 30117 (second time, and looks fine). | SLS/195112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1899 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 281 Built at Nine Elms Works |
||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Dorchester (DOR) | ||
01/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) | ||
06/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fratton (FRA) | ||
04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 30281 | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) | ||
12/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (GFD) | ||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
12/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 30281 | ||
12/1951 | Scrapped | Scrapped |