Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2940 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16346 Week
» 69362 Month
» 188889 Year
» 3215742 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
284 |
m/e |
12/1899 |
British Railways |
30284 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 12/1899 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1899 |
DOR |
|
Dorchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
71A |
|
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
04/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
71C |
Dorchester |
5w/e |
31/07/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/05/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 284 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dorchester (DOR) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30284 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30284 |
|
|
05/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|