Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1965 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15371 Week
» 68387 Month
» 187914 Year
» 3214767 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
287 |
m/e |
01/1900 |
British Railways |
30287 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 01/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/09/1961 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1967 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1900 |
FRA |
|
Fratton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
01/07/1956 |
Newbury-Winchester District |
A journey on the 12.25 p.m. Newbury-Winchester, found traffic rather sparse, and the stations, including Winchester, in a very poor state of repair. A strange mixture of classes was working passenger trains on 1st July. No. 30287 worked into Newbury from Eastleigh and later worked forward to Didcot. No. 2240 gave the writer a very spirited run on the return 2.31 p.m. Winchester to Newbury, also working forward to Didcot, 56 m.p.h. being reached after leaving Churn, the engine riding very steadily, considering the duties for which they were designed . No. 3740 was on the Lambourn Branch trains, the Diesel rail-car having, as usual, failed. |
SLS/195608 |
28/10/1959 |
Eastleigh MPD (on shed out of use) |
On shed ex-Works:- 30519/692; on shed out of use:- 30117, 30287/9/300/782/5, 31735, 32101/510/76, 32677. |
SLS/195912 |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 287 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30287 |
|
|
26/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30287 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|