Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2672 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16078 Week
» 69094 Month
» 188621 Year
» 3215474 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
288 |
m/e |
02/1900 |
British Railways |
30288 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 02/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/12/1960 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1900 |
SAL |
|
Salisbury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
71A |
|
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
10/12/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/12/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
ex Works: Blue, 35017/26/28; dark green, 30752, 30858, 34009/17/26/44/51/53/88/89; lined black, 30050, 30117/28, 30285/8, 30482, 30707/58 Lord St. Levan, 30909/28. B.4 dock tanks 30096/102 have lost their names on repainting. No. 32425 has been repaired here, also 32151 (lined black), 32331/7, 32558. The I.3 tank, 32076, appears to be waiting scrap. |
SLS/195103 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 288 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30288 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30288 |
|
|
05/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|