Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4407 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23318 Week
» 88272 Month
» 290936 Year
» 3317789 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
289 |
m/e |
02/1900 |
British Railways |
30289 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 02/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/11/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SAL |
Salisbury |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/10/1959 |
Eastleigh MPD (on shed out of use) |
On shed ex-Works:- 30519/692; on shed out of use:- 30117, 30287/9/300/782/5, 31735, 32101/510/76, 32677. |
SLS/195912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 289 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plymouth Friary (PLY) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30289 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30289 |
|
|