Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 746 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14152 Week
» 67168 Month
» 186695 Year
» 3213548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
300 |
m/e |
12/1900 |
British Railways |
30300 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 12/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/03/1961 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DOR |
Dorchester |
P |
02/01/1948 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/03/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1947 |
Dorchester MPD |
'T.9' No. 300 has been transferred from Fratton to Dorchester to replace No. 281, which is now in store inside Dorchester shed. |
SLS/194802 |
28/10/1959 |
Eastleigh MPD (on shed out of use) |
On shed ex-Works:- 30519/692; on shed out of use:- 30117, 30287/9/300/782/5, 31735, 32101/510/76, 32677. |
SLS/195912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 300 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dorchester (DOR) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dorchester (DOR) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30300 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30300 |
|
|
04/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|