Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1529 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19332 Week
» 72348 Month
» 191875 Year
» 3218728 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
346 |
m/e |
08/1897 |
British Railways |
30346 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Black Motors |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 08/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/11/1962 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GFD |
Guildford |
4w/e |
26/09/1947 |
ALLOC |
FEL |
Feltham |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
04/01/1962 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
4w/e |
01/02/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/09/1963 |
Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) |
Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 346 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30346 |
|
|
04/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
01/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30346 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|