Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4740 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18783 Week
» 83737 Month
» 286401 Year
» 3313254 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
398 |
m/e |
07/1903 |
British Railways |
30398 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
S11 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 07/1903 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1951 |
Service Life |
48 yrs , 5 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1903 |
SAL |
|
Salisbury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
70D |
|
Basingstoke |
6w/e |
20/03/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
12/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
70D |
Basingstoke |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/11/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 398 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30398 |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30398 |
|
|
12/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|