Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 320 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18123 Week
» 71139 Month
» 190666 Year
» 3217519 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
403 |
m/e |
12/1903 |
British Railways |
30403 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
S11 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 12/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 01/10/1951 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1903 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
BM |
|
Bournemouth |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/10/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BM |
Bournemouth |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/09/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 403 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
01/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30403 |
|
|
10/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/10/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30403 |
|
|