Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1337 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19140 Week
» 72156 Month
» 191683 Year
» 3218536 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
424 |
m/e |
11/1904 |
British Railways |
30424 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Bulldogs |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 11/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/07/1951 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
FRA |
Fratton |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
BM |
Bournemouth |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
DOR |
Dorchester |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
TOSTORE |
71C |
Dorchester |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/07/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 424 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
01/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dorchester (DOR) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30424 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30424 |
|
|
08/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|