Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1582 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19385 Week
» 72401 Month
» 191928 Year
» 3218781 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
455 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
British Railways |
30455 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 03/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/04/1959 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SAL |
Salisbury |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
REINS |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
TOSTORE |
UNK |
|
10w/e |
07/10/1952 |
TOSTORE |
70A |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
08/01/1953 |
REINS |
70A |
Nine Elms |
3w/e |
27/03/1953 |
TOSTORE |
70A |
Nine Elms |
8w/e |
13/05/1954 |
REINS |
70A |
Nine Elms |
6w/e |
22/06/1954 |
ALLOC |
70D |
Basingstoke |
q/e |
08/10/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/04/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/08/1958 |
Urie \"N15\" Class |
The only engine of the class to have a large type Maunsell chimney was No. E742, this being replaced in 1925 by a King Arthur chimney. No. E743 was one of the first to receive the latter type mentioned. A larger variety of stove-pipe chimney with louvres was fitted to No. E755 in 1925. Tender numbering was commenced in 1927. Under the auspices of British Railways, numbers 747/50 figured in the initial B.R. regional prefix scheme whereby they became Nos. S747 and S750 in January, 1948. M.B. It will be observed from the illustration on page 244, that No. 30740 had acquired a six-wheel tender for the purpose of the 'staged' derailment. The large eight-wheel outside frames bogie tenders originally supplied to the class were removed upon withdrawal of the engines and have since replaced older and six-wheel tenders on other engines. A few of the engines which have received these tenders of late are: Nos. 30450/3/4/5/88, 30505/6/10, 30785/95, an 30802. |
SLS/195810 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 455, name: SIR LAUNCELOT Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30455 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30455 |
|
|
05/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|