Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1326 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19129 Week
» 72145 Month
» 191672 Year
» 3218525 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
456 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
British Railways |
30456 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 04/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/05/1960 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 456, name: SIR GALAHAD Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30456 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
01/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
05/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30456 |
|
|