Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3286 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16692 Week
» 69708 Month
» 189235 Year
» 3216088 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
516 |
m/e |
11/1921 |
British Railways |
30516 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie |
Class |
H16 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-2T |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 11/1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/11/1962 |
Service Life |
41 yrs , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1921 |
FEL |
|
Feltham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
71A |
|
Eastleigh |
6w/e |
09/02/1960 |
70B |
|
Feltham |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
6w/e |
09/02/1960 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. |
SLS/196002 |
11/09/1963 |
Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) |
Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 516 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30516 |
|
|
09/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30516 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|