Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1437 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19240 Week
» 72256 Month
» 191783 Year
» 3218636 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
710 |
m/e |
06/1899 |
British Railways |
30710 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 06/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/03/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1899 |
YEO |
|
Yeovil Town |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
70C |
|
Guildford |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
72B |
|
Salisbury |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
REINS |
72B |
Salisbury |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 710 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yeovil Town (YEO) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30710 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
14/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30710 |
|
|
04/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|