Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1408 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14814 Week
» 67830 Month
» 187357 Year
» 3214210 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
739 |
m/e |
02/1919 |
British Railways |
30739 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 02/1919 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/05/1957 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1942 |
Sightings |
'D1' tanks 2259 an 2299 were at New Cross recently, the latter being now in its seventieth year (originally 6 Wimbledon). The only 'Remembrance' class not on loan to the G.W.R. is 2333, shed BZ. 4-4-0's 1151 and 1445 are still green with large tender numerals, and the latter replaced a 0-6-2T as one of the East Croydon pilots on 18/12. 4-6-0 498 was recently seen in Temple Meads. There are ten 'King Arthurs' on loan to the L.N.E.R., 739, 740/2/4, 747-751 an 154; they, have been working from Heaton. |
SLS/194302 |
06/01/1943 |
Heaton shed |
Heaton shed on 6/1/43 was very interesting, if only because of the presence of four S.R. 'N.15's' (Nos. 739/40/4/50). A fitter working on 739 told me that according to one of the best Heaton drivers, the 'K.3' was at least the equal of the 'N.15' but 739, 'not such a bad loco. taking all into consideration'. We would like to enquire whether |
SLS/194302 |
28/02/1949 |
Eastleigh Works |
'Merchant Navy' Class No. 35024 East Asiatic Company was ex Works painted blue, with red lining and carrying the British Railways crest on the tender. Locomotives ex Works during February, painted malachite green included: Nos. 30739, 30797, 30805, 30924, 34031/41/46/50/52 an 35013/29. Locomotives painted black and fully lined included:-Nos. 30673, 32028/79 an 32151, while those painted plain black included Nos. 32022/27. Several 'Schools' were awaiting boilers, which are being constructed at Crewe. |
SLS/194904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 739, name: KING LEODEGRANCE Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30739 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
05/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/05/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30739 |
|
|