Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
752 |
m/e |
12/1922 |
British Railways |
30752 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
12/1922 |
LINETTE |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 12/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/12/1955 |
Service Life |
33 yrs , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1922 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
BM |
|
Bournemouth |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
17/12/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/01/1948 |
Eastleigh MPD |
The following oil-burning locomotives were on Eastleigh shed: Nos. 121, 155/57, 170, 286, 411/63, 713/40/45/48 an 752. |
SLS/194802 |
31/01/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
ex Works: Blue, 35017/26/28; dark green, 30752, 30858, 34009/17/26/44/51/53/88/89; lined black, 30050, 30117/28, 30285/8, 30482, 30707/58 Lord St. Levan, 30909/28. B.4 dock tanks 30096/102 have lost their names on repainting. No. 32425 has been repaired here, also 32151 (lined black), 32331/7, 32558. The I.3 tank, 32076, appears to be waiting scrap. |
SLS/195103 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 752, name: LINETTE Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30752 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
12/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30752 |
|
|
01/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|