Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19135 Week
» 72151 Month
» 191678 Year
» 3218531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
764 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
British Railways |
30764 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/01/1947 |
Ashford Station |
'D' class 4-4-0 No. 1726 came into Ashford at 4.15 on 2/1/47, with a train that consisted of one corridor 3rd coach and one non-corridor 3rd brake only. 'King Arthur' class 4-6-0 No. 764 was seen running light up the 'up' through line at Ashford on the afternoon of 2/1/47, and was in the shed yard at Ramsgate the next afternoon. |
SLS/194702 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 764, name: SIR GAWAIN Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (RAM) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30764 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
07/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
12/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
05/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
24/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30764 |
|
|
08/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|