Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2151 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19954 Week
» 72970 Month
» 192497 Year
» 3219350 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
777 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
British Railways |
30777 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/10/1964 |
Stratford Works (Old Erecting shop) |
Old Erecting shop:, Locos. for preservation : LYR 1008, 30245/587/777/850/925, 33001, 49395, 71000, 63460, 63601 for preservation. (Note that GWR ones are still at Swindon.) |
SLS/196411 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 777, name: SIR LAMIEL Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30777 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
08/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
05/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30777 |
|
|