Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 26 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17829 Week
» 70845 Month
» 190372 Year
» 3217225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
790 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
British Railways |
30790 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BM |
Bournemouth |
m/e |
31/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
70D |
Basingstoke |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
TOSTORE |
UNK |
|
10w/e |
07/10/1952 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
08/01/1953 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
27/03/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
13/05/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/11/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 790, name: SIR VILLIARS Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30790 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30790 |
|
|
01/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|