Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1122 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14528 Week
» 67544 Month
» 187071 Year
» 3213924 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
800 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
British Railways |
30800 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 09/1926 |
Withdrawal |
During 08/1961 |
Service Life |
34 yrs , 11 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 800, name: SIR MELEAUS DE LILE Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30800 |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30800 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|