Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1840 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15246 Week
» 68262 Month
» 187789 Year
» 3214642 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
901 |
m/e |
03/1930 |
British Railways |
30901 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 03/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/12/1962 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STL |
St Leonards |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
TOSTORE |
74E |
St Leonards |
5w/e |
08/10/1951 |
REINS |
74E |
St Leonards |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
8w/e |
06/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1948 |
Eastleigh Works |
Further locomotives ex Works painted malachite green and lined include Nos. 30779, 30805, 30913/37, while those painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30901/31. New 'Merchant Navy' Class Nos. 35021-22 are painted malachite green, but were not lined when first seen; No. 35023, which was on steam trials on 5/11, was malachite green and lined. Frames are set up for the ex L.M.S. type 2-6-4T's, which are to be built here. Locomotives awaiting Works on 5/11 included:-Nos. 902/09/10/35 and Beattie 2-4-OWT No. 3314. The only 'IlX' Class remaining at Eastleigh are Nos. 2004 an 2598, while those of the class which have been condemned are being broken up at Dinton. |
SLS/194812 |
29/12/1962 |
Southern Region |
On 29th December, Hove goods yard dump contained 30901/11/5/23, 32338/41/2, 32417/8/74/9 but owing to shortage of power 32474/9 were removed again early in January, 32479 going to Brighton and 32474 to Three Bridges where it has taken turns on the East Grinstead shuttle service in place of H Class engines (push/pull); as a lot of time was lost running round it is understood that M7s or standard 2-6-2Ts are to be provided to enable motor-working to be resumed. Although all 'withdrawn', some '700' class 0-6-0s are still in use on snowplough work and one was stuck in a snowdrift for several days near Meldon summit. 30306 was in steam at Guildford on 19th January. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 901 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30901 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30901 |
|
|
08/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|