Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2227 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20030 Week
» 73046 Month
» 192573 Year
» 3219426 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
908 |
m/e |
07/1930 |
British Railways |
30908 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 07/1930 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/09/1961 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/04/1958 |
Wainwright \"D\" |
I was on the footplate of a Wainwright 'D' 4-4-0 in April, 1958, although the class was officially extinct about two years ago. Our friend and member, Mr. W. E. Coney, has had plans and parts ready to restore Ashford-built No. 31737 to S.E.C.R. 737 in the Works there to all her one-time glory but, alas, authority to proceed is so far withheld and the veteran is becoming more rusty and forlorn in the open. In the busy Shops at Ashford new inside cylinders with steam chests, etc., are being turned out for both classes of Pacifics rebuilding at Eastleigh; also new cylinders and front ends for S.R. Moguls continuing to be modified there. ' Schools ' lately painted green include 30908 Westminster, 30927 Clifton. The ' oldest-of-all ' now, No. 32636, 1872-built Stroudley ' Terrier ' once named Fenchurch, sold by the L.B.S.C.R. to the Newhaven Harbour Company in 1898, purchased by the S.R. with the whole undertaking in 1927, is still at work in smart-lined black, shunting at St. Leonards, West Marina & Loco. Yds. or taking the Kent & East Sussex daily freight at the time of writing in Yds., it shared with the slightly younger sister OP '0-6-0T No. 32678 which had been in Isle of Wight stock, one at each end (as at hop-picking passenger time during recent Septembers) in hauling the Branch Line Society's 4-corridor special from Robertsbridge to Tenterden and back, ex-K.E.S.R., on April 12, while our A.G.M. was in progress at H.Q. One little tank alone had rather a struggle on account of priming to get the empty train up the climbs on the direct London line from St. Leonards to Battle at the start of the afternoon. |
SLS/195805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 908 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30908 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
23/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30908 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|