Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 831 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14237 Week
» 67253 Month
» 186780 Year
» 3213633 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
928 |
m/e |
06/1934 |
British Railways |
30928 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
0000 |
STOWE |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 06/1934 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/11/1962 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1947 |
General |
928-9 are at present on loan to the Eastern Section. |
SLS/194706 |
31/01/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
ex Works: Blue, 35017/26/28; dark green, 30752, 30858, 34009/17/26/44/51/53/88/89; lined black, 30050, 30117/28, 30285/8, 30482, 30707/58 Lord St. Levan, 30909/28. B.4 dock tanks 30096/102 have lost their names on repainting. No. 32425 has been repaired here, also 32151 (lined black), 32331/7, 32558. The I.3 tank, 32076, appears to be waiting scrap. |
SLS/195103 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1934 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 928 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30928 |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
09/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30928 |
|
|