|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/09/1945 | Eastern Section | Schools Class 930 (BAS) has been working on the Eastern Section at least since 23/9 when she worked to Hastings. She has a high sided self-trimming tender. Class C 1480 has been transferred from STL, where D class 1488 has joined 1075, 1740/4, the latter being shown as Class D1 in error in the allocation published in the November Journal. B1 1021, 1440/55/7 are TON. | SLS/194602 |
30/04/1947 | Salisbury Station | In the course of six hours' observation by Mr. G. Pearce at Salisbury in April only one 0-6-0 was noted: a veteran '0395' class No. 3441, though there were plenty of mixed traffic 4-6-O's, three 'U' 2-6-O's, a number of Drummond 4-4-O's and the usual 'Merchant Navy,' 'West Country,' and 'King Arthur' classes. 'V' No. 930 came in from Brighton and is apparently remaining at that shed (though the through trains from Sussex to the West have been severely cut); Eastleigh 'D15' are the regular locos. east of Salisbury (with Brighton men) on the Brighton-Plymouth service. 'V' Nos. | SLS/194706 |
11/09/1963 | Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) | Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1934 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 930 Built at Eastleigh Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) | ||
07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 30930 | ||
01/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) | ||
12/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
09/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
04/01/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
01/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
17/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
30/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 30930 | ||
04/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |