Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3012 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16418 Week
» 69434 Month
» 188961 Year
» 3215814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
931 |
m/e |
12/1934 |
British Railways |
30931 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 12/1934 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/09/1961 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/03/1947 |
General |
On 29/3 No. 903, was seen piloting No. 931 on the 1.2 p.m. Cannon Street-Hastings, a very unusual occurrence. |
SLS/194705 |
30/11/1948 |
Eastleigh Works |
Further locomotives ex Works painted malachite green and lined include Nos. 30779, 30805, 30913/37, while those painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30901/31. New 'Merchant Navy' Class Nos. 35021-22 are painted malachite green, but were not lined when first seen; No. 35023, which was on steam trials on 5/11, was malachite green and lined. Frames are set up for the ex L.M.S. type 2-6-4T's, which are to be built here. Locomotives awaiting Works on 5/11 included:-Nos. 902/09/10/35 and Beattie 2-4-OWT No. 3314. The only 'IlX' Class remaining at Eastleigh are Nos. 2004 an 2598, while those of the class which have been condemned are being broken up at Dinton. |
SLS/194812 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1934 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 931 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30931 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
10/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
23/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30931 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|