Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 187 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3219 Week
» 21271 Month
» 254191 Year
» 1919567 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1019 m/e 07/1908
British Railways 31019 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class E1A
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1908
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/04/1961
Service Life 52 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1908
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
72B   Salisbury 5w/e 18/07/1959
72B   Salisbury 4w/e 05/04/1960
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/05/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 29/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 5w/e 18/07/1959
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 06/05/1960
WDN   w/e 29/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1019
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31019    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
06/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
29/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31019    
06/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev