Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3538 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17581 Week
» 82535 Month
» 285199 Year
» 3312052 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1037 |
m/e |
03/1901 |
British Railways |
31037 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 03/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/02/1961 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1037 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31037 |
|
|
11/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
08/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31037 |
|
|
03/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|