Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1054 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18857 Week
» 71873 Month
» 191400 Year
» 3218253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1057 |
m/e |
06/1902 |
British Railways |
31057 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
Coppernobs |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 06/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/04/1951 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TON |
Tonbridge |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
RDG |
Reading (S.R.) |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1057 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
01/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31057 |
|
|
26/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/04/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31057 |
|
|