Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1483 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14889 Week
» 67905 Month
» 187432 Year
» 3214285 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1063 |
m/e |
07/1900 |
British Railways |
31063 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 07/1900 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1956 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
74C |
Dover Marine |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
73C |
Hither Green |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/03/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1063 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31063 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
04/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31063 |
|
|
04/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|