Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 241 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3273 Week
» 21325 Month
» 254245 Year
» 1919621 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1067 m/e 08/1908
British Railways 31067 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class E1A
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1908
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/11/1961
Service Life 53 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1908
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
72B   Salisbury 5w/e 18/07/1959
72B   Salisbury 4w/e 05/04/1960
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/05/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 11/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE BAT Stewarts Lane 5w/e 13/11/1948
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/04/1951
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 5w/e 18/07/1959
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 06/05/1960
WDN   w/e 11/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/11/1945 Hastings A special empty troop train of ten corridors, weighing 325 tons, from the Brighton direction to Dover, on 3/11, was worked by E1 1067, which called at Hastings for water, and to change guards. It was assisted up the 1 in 60 towards Ore by H 1305, which was an unusual engine to be working on the weekday Ashford-Hastings service. SLS/194602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1067
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31067    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
06/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
11/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31067    
12/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev