Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 109 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3622 Week
» 23915 Month
» 201819 Year
» 1867195 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1145 m/e 04/1903
British Railways 31145 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class D1
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 04/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1903
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74C   Dover Marine 4w/e 05/02/1951
70C   Guildford 4w/e 17/12/1956
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 24/02/1958
73A   Stewarts Lane 3w/e 13/10/1958
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 10/06/1950
REINS 74C Dover Marine 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/04/1951
REINS 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 17/12/1956
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 2w/e 13/10/1958
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1950 Ashford Works Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. SLS/195002
04/11/1961 Eastleigh Works (Scrap Yard) Erecting Shop: D5000/3, D6530, E5008, 3733, 7782, 9629/77, 15211/34, 30051/7, 30480, 30543/7, 30830, 30921, 31808, 32343, 33028/33/40, 34015/49/57/63, 34103/10, 35010/27, 41206, 41324, 73020, 76059, 80145, 82013. Works Yard: 9732, 15233, 30120, 30859/, 34037/50/99, 76060/8, 92211. Scrap Yard: 30277, 30858, 31145, 31505. SLS/196112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1145
Built at Dübs & Co
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31145    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
17/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31145    
12/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev