Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 68 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 23699 Week
» 88653 Month
» 291317 Year
» 3318170 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1158 |
m/e |
12/1909 |
British Railways |
31158 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 12/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/04/1955 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1950 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. |
SLS/194704 |
30/06/1950 |
General |
Three I.1X locomotives have recently been transferred from Bognor to New Cross Gate, namely 2002, 2008, 2596. 'H' tanks Nos. 1158 an 1319 are being fitted for pull-and-push working. 'D.3' 32365, of air attack fame, originally Victoria, has been repaired at Ashford. Several 'B.4X' ex store were working at the end of June, in readiness for use if required on Farnborough Air Pageant Specials; for these the E.R. (G.E. Section) lent a number of Westinghouse-fitted trains as traffic was expected to be heavy. |
SLS/195008 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1158 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31158 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
29/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
10/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
16/04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31158 |
|
|