Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 243 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3275 Week
» 21327 Month
» 254247 Year
» 1919623 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1165 m/e 12/1907
British Railways 31165 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class E1A
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/05/1959
Service Life 51 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1907
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BA   Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 01/08/1948
73A   Stewarts Lane 2w/e 20/05/1950
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 05/02/1951
73A   Stewarts Lane 5w/e 14/02/1953
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 26/05/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 02/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 2w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 26/05/1953
WDN   w/e 02/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1907 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1165
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
01/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31165    
20/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
05/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    
02/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31165    

prev prev