Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 130 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3643 Week
» 23936 Month
» 201840 Year
» 1867216 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1179 m/e 11/1908
British Railways 31179 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class E1A
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1908
Withdrawal During 10/1950
Service Life 41 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1908
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BA   Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 01/08/1948
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1950
74A   Ashford 4w/e 08/12/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 01/08/1948
WDN   on 30/12/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1179
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
01/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31179    
10/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 31179    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
03/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev