Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1221 |
m/e |
03/1901 |
British Railways |
31221 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 03/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/08/1959 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/05/1948 |
General |
Early in May the Beattie 0-6-OT No. 4 withdrawn from the K.E.S.R. was standing at Headcom and some of the local Company's old rolling stock was being broken up. 'Q.1' Class Nos. C31-35 have gone to Tonbridge, whilst C36-40 are at Stewarts Lane and Guildford have received 'C' Class Nos. 1086/90, 1221/25/27/93 an 1508. |
SLS/194806 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1221 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31221 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
08/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
08/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
15/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31221 |
|
|