Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 152 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3665 Week
» 23958 Month
» 201862 Year
» 1867238 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1247 m/e 04/1903
British Railways 31247 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class D1
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/07/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 3 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1903
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
DOV   Dover Marine 4w/e 06/10/1948
73E   Faversham 5w/e 11/12/1952
70C   Guildford 4w/e 17/12/1956
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 24/02/1958
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 22/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine 4w/e 06/10/1948
REINS 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 27/06/1951
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
TOSTORE 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 08/01/1953
TOSTORE 74C Dover Marine 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 11/12/1954
TOSTORE 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 74C Dover Marine w/e 13/06/1955
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 17/12/1956
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 22/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/07/1961 Ashford Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1247
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
06/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (DOV)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31247    
11/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
17/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
22/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31247    
09/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev