Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3833 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17239 Week
» 70255 Month
» 189782 Year
» 3216635 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1269 |
m/e |
11/1905 |
British Railways |
31269 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 11/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 12/12/1959 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
29/10/1953 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1269 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31269 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
29/10/1953 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
29/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31269 |
|
|