Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1886 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15292 Week
» 68308 Month
» 187835 Year
» 3214688 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1270 |
m/e |
06/1904 |
British Railways |
31270 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 06/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/06/1959 |
Service Life |
55 yrs , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1904 |
HIT |
|
Hither Green |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
74D |
|
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HIT |
Hither Green |
m/e |
30/11/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1948 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives ex Ashford Works with smokebox number-plates have included Nos. 31270, 31521, 31781/84. Ex East Kent Rly. 0-6-OT No. 30948 is to be stored here. |
SLS/194811 |
12/05/1951 |
Ashford Works |
In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1270 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31270 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
06/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31270 |
|
|