Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 105 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3618 Week
» 23911 Month
» 201815 Year
» 1867191 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1276 m/e 06/1905
British Railways 31276 y/e 1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/02/1961
Service Life 55 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1905
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74A   Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951
74B   Ramsgate 4w/e 19/03/1952
74A   Ashford 4w/e 01/10/1953
75A   Brighton 6w/e 14/06/1959
73J   Tonbridge m/e 10/02/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 25/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 8w/e 19/03/1952
ALLOC 74A Ashford 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 10/02/1961
WDN   w/e 25/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/10/1953 Push and Pull Fitted
29/10/1953 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (SR) Engines running with Southern Numbers. (March 1952) 42, 87, 88, 93, 162, 224, 304, 311, 691, 1064/5, 1191, 1276, 1336, 1491/3, 1558, 1574, 1673, 1693, 1708, 1711/8, 1755, 2133, 2328, 2418, 2485, 2560/73, 2608. Stored (oil-burners): 170, 172, 411, 437. Recently in shops: 282, 2408. Some of these may be renumbered, as there has been no recent official advice. SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1905 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1276
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 31276    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
01/10/1953 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
29/10/1953 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
25/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31276    
05/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev