Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 137 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3650 Week
» 23943 Month
» 201847 Year
» 1867223 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1279 m/e 11/1909
British Railways 31279 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1909
Withdrawal During 09/1959
Service Life 49 yrs , 10 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1909
FAV   Faversham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
STL   St Leonards 4w/e 12/03/1949
74A   Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951
74E   St Leonards 9w/e 30/06/1952
74D   Tonbridge q/e 06/06/1958
75A   Brighton 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn m/e 09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STL St Leonards 4w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 74E St Leonards m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 8w/e 06/06/1958
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 03/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1953 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1279
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31279    
12/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (STL)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
03/1953 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
06/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31279    
10/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev