|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/01/1951 | Ashford Works | New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. | SLS/195102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1909 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1279 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV) | ||
07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31279 | ||
12/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Leonards (STL) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ashford (74A) | ||
30/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) | ||
03/1953 | Modification | Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted | ||
06/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31279 | ||
10/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |