Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1988 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15394 Week
» 68410 Month
» 187937 Year
» 3214790 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1293 |
m/e |
06/1908 |
British Railways |
31293 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 06/1908 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/05/1962 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GFD |
Guildford |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/05/1948 |
General |
Early in May the Beattie 0-6-OT No. 4 withdrawn from the K.E.S.R. was standing at Headcom and some of the local Company's old rolling stock was being broken up. 'Q.1' Class Nos. C31-35 have gone to Tonbridge, whilst C36-40 are at Stewarts Lane and Guildford have received 'C' Class Nos. 1086/90, 1221/25/27/93 an 1508. |
SLS/194806 |
03/01/1950 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. |
SLS/195002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1293 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31293 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
05/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31293 |
|
|