Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 832 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6232 Week
» 24284 Month
» 257204 Year
» 1922580 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1295 m/e 12/1909
British Railways 31295 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/05/1959
Service Life 49 yrs , 6 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1909
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74A   Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951
73E   Faversham 4w/e 27/07/1951
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 9w/e 30/06/1952
74E   St Leonards 8w/e 20/07/1953
74D   Tonbridge q/e 06/06/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 30/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73E Faversham 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 74E St Leonards 6w/e 20/07/1953
TOSTORE 74E St Leonards 5w/e 16/09/1955
REINS 74E St Leonards 7w/e 19/12/1955
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 8w/e 06/06/1958
WDN   w/e 30/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/05/1950 Brighton Works Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. SLS/195006
10/06/1950 Brighton Works On the occasion of the Works visit on Saturday, 10th June, the following were noted: e20001 (new livery), 31295 (lined), 31706, 32460, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34074, 34082 615 Squadron (30)272, 32636 (lined, waiting boiler), 42096 (tanks being fitted), 42097 (boiler in), frames up to 42102, frames of 34110, 77108/90570 (V.F.4924/43), 77359/90207, 90702, 77030/90127, and the works shunters 377S an 2235. Diesel 15203 was still outside after repair and repaint. The transfer of the 'W.D. 8F' proceeds apace; they were most useful on the Southern Region for maintaining quick goods working between the frequent passenger services (mostly electric), as they had a good turn of speed;, and they were used on empty stock and mixed trains. SLS/195007

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1295
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31295    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
06/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
05/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    
30/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31295    

prev prev