Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 101 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3614 Week
» 23907 Month
» 201811 Year
» 1867187 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1298 m/e 03/1908
British Railways 31298 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1908
Withdrawal During 11/1960
Service Life 52 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1908
HIT   Hither Green on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
RAM   Ramsgate 5w/e 15/10/1949
73E   Faversham 9w/e 12/06/1957
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73C   Hither Green 6w/e 09/02/1960
     Withdrawn m/e 11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RAM Ramsgate 5w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 73E Faversham q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 6w/e 09/02/1960
WDN   w/e 03/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1298
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31298    
15/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (RAM)    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31298    
01/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev