Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3171 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16577 Week
» 69593 Month
» 189120 Year
» 3215973 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1307 |
m/e |
12/1906 |
British Railways |
31307 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 12/1906 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 26/08/1961 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1307 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31307 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
11/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
19/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31307 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|